+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Filed