+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed