+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor