+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Record vote
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor