+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed