+ − Actions (39)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Filed