+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Adopted
- Record vote
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/15/2019
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/1/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor