+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed