+ − Actions (18)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in formal meeting
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor