+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed