+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed