+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor