+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Adopted
- Record vote
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Filed