+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on intent calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed