+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed