+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Received from the House
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor