+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor