+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed