+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Record vote
- Postponed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Postponed
- Amended
- Amended
- Adopted as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor