+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Considered in public hearing
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
- Laid before the House
- Adopted
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed