+ − Actions (12)
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor