+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
- Considered in public hearing
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recalled from subcommittee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on4/3/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor