+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/13/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on2/27/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor