+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On December 22, 2010 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor