+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On August 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On August 1, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On July 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On July 28, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On July 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On July 25, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On July 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Filed