+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Remarks ordered printed
On May 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor