+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 3rd time
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Point of order overruled
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor