+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
- Corrected comm. report distributed
- Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to State Sovereignty, Select
- Correction in referral
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor