+ − Actions (9)
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor