+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
- Read first time
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed