+ − Actions (29)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Laid before the House
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Rules suspended
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor