+ − Actions (18)
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted as amended
- Amended
- Laid before the House
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor