+ − Actions (14)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor