+ − Actions (18)
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- Adopted
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Laid before the Senate
- Read
- Adopted
- Printed in full
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Filed