+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Administration
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/24/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor