+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor