+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Bonnen, Dennis
Type:
Primary Sponsor