+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor