+ − Actions (70)
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote reconsidered
- Postponed
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as amended
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Correction in referral
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Filed