+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (55)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion withdrawn
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Motion to suspend three day rule
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 2, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Filed