+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Laid out as postponed business
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled
- Amended
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Point of order overruled
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor