+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Testimony taken in subcommittee
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor