+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Calendars Committee
- Point of order sustained
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Filed