+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Filed