+ − Actions (74)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On June 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- House adopts conference committee report
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 3rd time
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor