+ − Actions (49)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Filed