+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Manufacturing by chair
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor