+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Point of order sustained
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
King, Susan
Type:
Primary Sponsor