+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor