+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Davis, John
Type:
Primary Sponsor